تو این پستم اعمال ضرب جالبی ارائه کردم دیدنش خالی از لطف نیست....

 


24×21 =504                                   12×84 =1008

42 ×12=504                                   21×48 =1008


12×63 =756                                   84×36 =3024

21×36 =756                                   48×63 =3024

 

13×62 =806                                  36×42 =1512

31×26 =806                                   63×24 =1512

 

23×96 =2208                                 84×24 =2016

32×69 =2208                                 48×42=2016